This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 02/02/2023 at 08:19:37 (UTC).

In the Estate of Susan R. Aebersold

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 In the Estate of Susan R Aebersold was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Basting, Kanndie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0032

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Basting, Kanndie

 

Party Details

Decedent

Aebersold, Susan R.

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Not Yet Classified

Aebersold-Evans, Jennifer

Clayton, NC 27527

Aebersold, Amy

Clayton, NC 27527

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Keyes, Dean J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Amended Inventory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $108330.57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $216.66; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 000188, Payable Number: 118641, Amount: $216.66

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Petition to extend time to file inventory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Order for Extension of Time to File Inventory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Probate claims notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Jennifer Aebersold-Evans & Amy Aebersold

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: to Jennifer Aebersold-Evans

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: to Jennifer Aebersold - Evans

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Final Claim Date: November 9, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less