This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 08/29/2022 at 12:48:39 (UTC).

In the Estate of Sidney J Noss

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 In the Estate of Sidney J Noss was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Timmerman, Jodi and Trewyn, Krista. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0341

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Timmerman, Jodi

Trewyn, Krista

 

Party Details

Decedent

Noss, Sidney J

Not Yet Classified

Doll, Phyllis

Kethoe, Sonja

Ennis, Cynthia

Pins, Jacqueline

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Sauer, John C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Trewyn, Krista

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Trewyn, Krista

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Trewyn, Krista

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: Phyllis Doll

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: claims deadline 10/6/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Timmerman, Jodi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will; Additional Text: signed March 12, 2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Cover letter enclosing original will

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sauer, John C.