This case was last updated from Dane County Courts on 08/23/2022 at 13:02:05 (UTC).

In the Estate of Shelly G Kubicek

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 In the Estate of Shelly G Kubicek was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dane County Courts, Dane County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Esqueda, Carlo, Behrens, Danell and Schulenburg, Benjamin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0476

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dane, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Esqueda, Carlo

Behrens, Danell

Schulenburg, Benjamin

 

Party Details

Decedent

Kubicek, Shelly G

Administrator

Kubicek, Heather M

Not Yet Classified

Kubicek, Tyler A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

Strohschein, Alan J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: (1) certified Special Administration Letter mailed to Atty Alan Strohschein on 8-9-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Schulenburg, Benjamin; Additional Text: Heather M. Kubicek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Court Official: Schulenburg, Benjamin; Additional Text: to: Heather M. Kubicek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition for summary assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $43.8; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 033738, Payable Number: 567443, Receipt Number: 22RS027709, Amount: $43.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Heather Kubicek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order appointing special administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Tyler Kubicek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Heather M Kubicek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summary assignment notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed special administration letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: Will dated 10/12/2018 (retrieved from 21PR777 & 21WL720)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strohschein, Alan J.