This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 02/01/2023 at 17:25:34 (UTC).

In the Estate of Rodney E Best

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 In the Estate of Rodney E Best was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hoffman, Gwen, Kussel, William F., Jr and Kast, Tiffany L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0066

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hoffman, Gwen

Kussel, William F., Jr

Kast, Tiffany L

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Sigetich, Jeff

Wausau, WI 54401

Sugetich, Jeff

Wausau, WI 54401

Wierzba, Paul

Wittenberg, WI 54499

Lust, Shirley

New Glarus, WI 53574

Wierzba, Alan

Rosholt, WI 54473

Wierzba, Lisa Mary

Wittenberg, WI 54499

Decedent

Best, Rodney E

Wittenberg, WI 54499

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

Woods, J Edison, Jr

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Hoffman, Gwen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.; Additional Text: 2:02 PM Attorney J Edison Woods Jr in court for Rodney E Best and Paul Wierzba. Atty Woods asks court for an order directing Marshfield Clinic to deliver in writing what the patient's responsibility is by noon on 2-6-23. Court orders. Atty Woods to prepare order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.; Additional Text: 1:37 PM. Attorney Woods updated the court on the status of the matter. Is asking for a court date to notify the claimant and have them appear to get the estate receipt. Court agrees. Hearing scheduled for Friday, January 20, 2023 at 1:45pm. No objections. Adjourned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Jeff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Paul, Alan, Lisa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: cover letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act; Additional Text: Jeff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice interested persons/ filing claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Court Official: Hoffman, Gwen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice interested persons/time limit filing claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less