This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 07/12/2022 at 12:49:51 (UTC).

In the Estate of Robyn Marie Boyd

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 In the Estate of Robyn Marie Boyd was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0058

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Decedent

Boyd, Robyn Marie

Not Yet Classified

Heath, Danielle

Boyd, Nicholas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Otto, Andrew L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Notice of Creditors and Probate Claims Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter from Attorney Otto requesting certified copies of domiciliary letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $4.0; Additional Text: 22R 009996

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $12.0; Additional Text: 22R 009996

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and consent-Danielle Heath

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and consent-Nicholas Boyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Domiciliary letters issued to Danielle Heath

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Otto, Andrew L.