This case was last updated from Adams County Courts on 05/28/2022 at 12:53:27 (UTC).

In the Estate of Robert Torstenson

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 In the Estate of Robert Torstenson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Adams County Courts, Adams County Circuit Court located in Waukesha, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Wood, Daniel G and Koback, Kathe M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0026

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Adams, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Wood, Daniel G

Koback, Kathe M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Torstenson, Robert

Adams, WI 53910

Administrator

Cullen, Dorothy

Salem, WI 53168

Interested Parties

Torstenson, Lynn A

Salem, WI 53168

Sanchez, Diana M.

Adams, WI 53910

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

Edenhofer, Carl Raymond, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $39.0; Additional Text: 22R 001531

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Edenhofer Law Offices, SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Per call from Julia @ Attorney Edenhofer's office, the Annuity value is $29,500.00. The beneficiary listed on the annuity was his wife, Betty Torstenson, who passed away in 2017. The company who holds the annuity wants a special administration along with the Transfer by Affidavit to release the funds from the Annuity to the family members. - kmk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of summary procedures deadline; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.; Additional Text: Twelve month closing date on March 29, 2023 at 08:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition for administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 020148, Payable Number: 74528, Receipt Number: 22R 001461, Amount: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Dorothy Cullen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Diane Sanchez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Lynn Torstenson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Dorothy Cullen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order appointing special administrator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edenhofer, Carl Raymond, Jr.