This case was last updated from Richland County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2023 at 17:21:05 (UTC).

In the Estate of Philip Alan Ekleberry

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 In the Estate of Philip Alan Ekleberry was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Richland County Wisconsin Courts, Richland County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Laue, Jenifer and McDougal, Lisa A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0040

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Richland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Laue, Jenifer

McDougal, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Decedent

Ekleberry, Philip Alan

Richland Center, WI 53581

Not Yet Classified

Bermudo, Laura L.

Spring Green, WI 53588

Ekleberry, Gage O.

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Ekleberry, Ivy E.

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Walsh, Julia T

Frank, Ted N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Laue, Jenifer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Laue, Jenifer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Laue, Jenifer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: To: Laura Bermudo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing GAL; Court Official: McDougal, Lisa A.; Additional Text: Attorney Ted Frank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 006366, Payable Number: 67600, Receipt Number: 22R 005050, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less