This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 23:51:47 (UTC).

In the Estate of Paul Jerome Fleming

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 In the Estate of Paul Jerome Fleming was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Fishbain, Bruce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0211

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Fishbain, Bruce

 

Party Details

Decedent

Fleming, Paul Jerome

Waterford, WI 53185

Not Yet Classified

Laufenberg, Jessica E.

Waukesha, WI 53188

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Davis, Zachary J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Probate, Register In

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce; Additional Text: Deadline for filing claims date is 9/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce; Additional Text: to: Jessica E. Laufenberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 328747, Payable Number: 456700, Receipt Number: 22R 004966F, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: signed by Jessica E. Laufenberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Death certificate; Additional Text: for Paul Jerome Fleming

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: signed by Jessica E. Laufenberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Cover letter to the Court Re: Filing from Atty. Zachary J. Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davis, Zachary J.