This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 08/08/2022 at 12:52:49 (UTC).

In the Estate of Natalie L. Patula

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 In the Estate of Natalie L Patula was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Kayartz, Julie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0067

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Kayartz, Julie

 

Party Details

Decedent

Patula, Natalie L.

Not Yet Classified

Kaul, Katrina M.

Hammon, Nicole D.

Havelka, Michael

Jacobs, Margie

Keizer, Daniel

Umland, Laurine

Hammond, Jay

Kaul, Ella H.

Kaul, William

Kaul, Abigail L.

Kaul, Nora G.

Johnson, Avis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Smiley, William A

Spankowski, Jesse B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Assignment of Interest in Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: to Michael Havelka - document(s) provided: Cover Letter, Copy of Will, Petition for Informal Administration, Proof of heirship, Notice to interested parties and creditors, proposed consent to act, consent to serve and order appointing GAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned order to show cause hearing; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie; Additional Text: Application hearing - Attorney Smiley appeared telephonically; no appearances or objections received. Proof of publication on file. Waivers and consents have been filed for some of the interested parties. Need an affidavit of mailing or waiver and consent filed for remaining interested parties. Upon said filing the Will to be admitted to probate and Katrina Kaul will be appointed personal representative.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: beneficiaries/heirs/interested parties - Laurine Umland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: beneficiaries/heirs/interested parties - Margie Jacobs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: beneficiaries/heirs/interested parties - by Jesse Spankowski, GAL

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 005410, Payable Number: 169453, Receipt Number: 22R 008572, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Other papers - eFiled copy of will for Natalie L. Patula - original already filed with the court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice interested persons/ filing claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice interested persons/time limit filing claims; Additional Text: Application will be heard in the Probate office on July 12, 2022 at 9:00 a.m.; Claims to be filed on/before: September 20, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing GAL; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie; Additional Text: Attorney Jesse Spankowski appointed GAL for Ella, William, Abigail and Nora Kaul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: Original - Last Will & Testament of June 11, 2021 dated Natalie L. Patula

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spankowski, Jesse B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smiley, William A