This case was last updated from Ashland County Courts on 04/22/2022 at 13:05:23 (UTC).

In the Estate of Michael S. Henri

Case Summary

On 02/21/2022 In the Estate of Michael S Henri was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ashland County Courts, Ashland County Circuit Court located in Waukesha, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McKnight, Kelly J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0010

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ashland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McKnight, Kelly J

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioners

Henri, Teresa

Ashland, WI 54806

Henri, Sheldon

Ashland, WI 54806

Henri, Derrick

Mellen, WI 54546

Cupelli, Sheena

Cross Plains, WI 53528

Newrez

P.O. Box 619063

Dallas, TX 75261

Decedent

Henri, Michael S.

Ashland, WI 54806

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Long, Ryan J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: cover letter, to RIP fr Atty Long re encl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Court Reporter: TAPE REPORTER; Additional Text: 02:02 PM Appearances in person. Attorney Ryan J. Long in court for Petitioner Teresa Henri. No other appearances. Hrg on pet for summ sttlmnt today. Atty RL: decedent owned partial interest in real estate encumbered by a mortgage, looking to clear title, for purpose of title company when sale occurs later this yr, filed pet for summ ju, notice mailed & published, POH filed, no obj filed, req Ct grant per's pet for summary settlement, filed prop order. Ct: rev'd pet & addl docs, finds decedent born 12/20/54, DOD 12/26/20, domiciled in Ashland, prop venue, notice given, petr is an interested person, estate properly settled under summary settlement, estate less debt does not exceed $50,000, decdent survived by spouse or dom prtnr or 1 or more minor children, detailed sttmnt of prop subj to admin less any encumbrance lien or other charge is as listed in prop order on pet filed by Atty RL, prop claims against estate in prop order (none), Ct grants pet & orders prop listed assigned to persons entitled to it as listed in prop order, Ct signs prop order. Out 2:05pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summary settlement-order of summary settlement; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: cover letter, to RIP fr Atty Long re encl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: on Petition for Summary Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: cover letter, to RIP fr Atty Long re encl Aff of Pub

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: cover letter, fr Atty Long re encl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order and notice for hearing; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: on Petition for Summary Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order and notice for hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: cover letter, to RIP fr Atty Long re encl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: obituary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition for summary settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 008963, Payable Number: 80850, Receipt Number: 22R 000839, Amount: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: cover letter, to RIP fr Atty Long re encl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Long, Ryan J.