This case was last updated from Adams County Courts on 04/15/2022 at 13:01:07 (UTC).

In the Estate of Max S Geiger

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 In the Estate of Max S Geiger was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Adams County Courts, Adams County Circuit Court located in Waukesha, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Koback, Kathe M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0014

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Adams, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Koback, Kathe M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Geiger, Max S

Nekoosa, WI 54457

Not Yet Classified

Geiger, Michael J

Nekoosa, WI 54457

Geiger, Carl M

Coloma, WI 54930

Whalen, Chrstine M

West Allis, WI 53214

Thellefesen, Toni

Ixonia, WI 53036

Moran, Timothy

Sussex, WI 53089

Moran, Bobbie Jo

West Allis, WI 53214

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Casey, Thomas J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $18117.3; Additional Text: Bank of America NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 22R 001176

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Letter requesting Certified Copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Michael & Carl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Christine Whalen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Toni Thellefsen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Timothy Moran

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Michael Geiger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Casey, Thomas J.