This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 02/05/2023 at 11:26:59 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mary Tatroe

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 In the Estate of Mary Tatroe was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheffler, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0320

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Sheffler, Brian

 

Party Details

Decedent

Tatroe, Mary

Kenosha, WI 53142

Not Yet Classified

Kreuger, Judith

Black Creek, WI 54106

Woller, Margaret

Madison, WI 53562

Merryfield, Kelly

Weyauwega, WI 54983

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Edenhofer, Carl Raymond, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: In the Kenosha News from: January 3 - January 17, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 23R 001856 - claim filed by Dept of Health Services for $95,562.88

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian; Additional Text: **Amended** deadline for filing a claim against the estate is 04-27-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian; Additional Text: **Amended**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian; Additional Text: deadline for filing a claim against the estate is 03-30-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian; Additional Text: to Kelly Merryfield

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 647181, Payable Number: 352692, Receipt Number: 22R 032319, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: 1 - Judith Krueger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: 1 - Kelly Merryfield

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: 1 - Margaret Woller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: by Kelly Merryfield

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less