This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2023 at 01:52:54 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mary Kathleen Dunn

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 In the Estate of Mary Kathleen Dunn was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Trempealeau, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0040

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Decedent

Dunn, Mary Kathleen

Others

Dunn-Topliff, Carolyn

Dunn, Marilyn A.

Not Yet Classified

Jones, Eleanor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Other Attorney

Jackson, Robert J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $13523.9; Additional Text: Claim filed by: Keuler Insurance Agency, Inc., 738 Center Street, Mineral Point, WI 53565 Amount of Claim: $13,523.90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 23RP000007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Additional Text: Claim filed by: Eleanor Jones, 106 W. Main St, Montfort, WI 53569 Amount of Claim: $262.38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 22RP000144

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Receipt for claim; Additional Text: - Brad Ladow

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 22RP000124

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $1550.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 002176, Payable Number: 117280, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Marilyn A Dunn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Carolyn Dunn Topliff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Marilyn A Dunn, Carolyn Dunn Topliff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order for administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order appointing special administrator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less