This case was last updated from Waupaca County Courts on 06/03/2022 at 13:01:54 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mary Jane Jole

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 In the Estate of Mary Jane Jole was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Waupaca County Courts, Waupaca County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Dahle, Angela and Nielsen, Troy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0031

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Waupaca, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Nielsen, Troy L

Dahle, Angela

 

Party Details

Decedent

Jole, Mary Jane

Clintonville, WI 54929

Interested Party

Jole, Donald R.

Clintonville, WI 54929

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Interested Party Attorney

Meyer, Michael C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Dahle, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Dahle, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: check number 17392 for $8.00 returned via mail to Atty. Meyer previously held since 4-6 by Probate Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition for administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 008692, Payable Number: 160805, Receipt Number: 22R 003337, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Additional Text: 1 issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: 2 signatures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Donald R. Jole

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order for administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will; Additional Text: originally filed in 22PR14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Michael C.