This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 05/30/2022 at 12:50:41 (UTC).

In the Estate of Martin Peltzer

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 In the Estate of Martin Peltzer was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Baker, Patrice and Barrett, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0585

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Baker, Patrice

Barrett, John

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sievers-von Geldern, Nadja Marie

Decedent

Peltzer, Martin

Interested Parties

Freifrau von Schorlemer, Alice Alexandra

Beckers, Sabine Lilli

Other

Walsh, Peter J.

Waukesha, WI 53186

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Walsh, Peter J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Baker, Patrice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Barrett, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order for administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for administration; Court Official: Baker, Patrice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Baker, Patrice; Court Reporter: Digital Recording; Additional Text: Appearances by: Attorney Peter Walsh Dr. Nadja Sievers RE: Petition for Formal Administration Sworn and Testified: Dr. Nadja Sievers Based upon the testimony of, Dr. Nadja Sievers, review of the documents filed, the Court finds that all interested parties have been properly noticed and the Court has jurisdiction. The Court approves the Proof of Heirship. The Court admits the Foreign Will to Probate. As NO one appears to object, the Court appoints Peter Walsh as Personal Representative with Bond in the amount of $250,000.00. The Court GRANTS the petition. The Court Orders that if all interested parties pledge excess surety then only a $10,000.00 Bond will be required.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order setting time to hear petition; Court Official: Baker, Patrice; Additional Text: Join Zoom Meeting May 25, 2022 at 3:45pm https://wicourts.zoom.us/j/91476879491?pwd=Qk52Y05HTHQrNytRcWdWWWRxc1pCdz09 Meeting ID: 914-7687-9491 Passcode: 790392 By Telephone Only: 1-312-626-6799, using same Meeting ID above.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Signed by Peter J. Walsh.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order setting time to hear petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition for administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 031749, Payable Number: 996977, Receipt Number: 22RP013439, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: Verified Petition for Admission of Foreign Will into Probate with Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval; Additional Text: Signed by Alice Alexandra Freifrau von Schorlemer, Sabine Lilli Beckers, Nadja Marie Sievers-von Geldern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Signed by Peter J. Walsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walsh, Peter J.