This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 05/05/2023 at 12:56:05 (UTC).

In the Estate of Lori J. Vujnovich

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 In the Estate of Lori J Vujnovich was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Dodge, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Steger, Lynn M and Behrens, Danell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0072

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Steger, Lynn M

Behrens, Danell

 

Party Details

Decedent

Vujnovich, Lori J.

Not Yet Classified

Vujnovich, Meagan

Marshfield Clinic Health System

UW Health-UW Hospital/UW Health-UW Medical Foundation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $4893.66; Additional Text: UW Health-UW Hospital/UW Health-UW Medical Foundation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 035456, Payable Number: 251947, Receipt Number: 23R 005752, Amount: $3.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate for Marshfield Clinic Health System; Amount: $1669.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 23R 005449

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Enclosing check for two certified copies of the Domiciliary Letters

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: by Meagan Vujnovich

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: to Meagan Vujnovich

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Claims limited to 6/23/2023; Publication: Beaver Dam Daily Citizen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Obituary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less