This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:49:25 (UTC).

In the Estate of Lloyd M. Musack

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 In the Estate of Lloyd M Musack was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Washington, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Steger, Lynn M and Behrens, Danell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Steger, Lynn M

Behrens, Danell

 

Party Details

Decedent

Musack, Lloyd M.

Not Yet Classified

Alexandrowicz, Jennifer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Codicil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Codicil admitted to probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 011265, Payable Number: 249812, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: from 2 of 2 interested persons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: by Jennifer Alexandrowicz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less