This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 02/02/2023 at 23:51:43 (UTC).

In the Estate of Kathryn Dabel

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 In the Estate of Kathryn Dabel was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Klicko, Wendy J. N and Koback, Kathe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Klicko, Wendy J. N

Koback, Kathe

 

Party Details

Decedents

Dabel, Kathryn

Hamlet, IN 46532

Mullarkey-Dabel, Kathryn

Hamlet, IN 46532

Mullarkey-Dailey, Kathryn

Hamlet, IN 46532

Mullarkey, Kathryn

Hamlet, IN 46532

Administrator

Hueneke, Christopher M.

Greenfield, WI 53220

Not Yet Classified

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee

3476 Stateview Blvd, C/O Wells Fargo Bank Na

Fort Mill, SC 29715

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Piette, Robert M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Koback, Kathe

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to decedent's deceased son.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Court Official: Klicko, Wendy J. N.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Klicko, Wendy J. N.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of summary procedures deadline; Court Official: Koback, Kathe; Additional Text: Twelve month closing date on January 5, 2024 at 08:35 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 000181, Payable Number: 257778, Receipt Number: 23R 000455, Amount: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Petition cover letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order appointing special administrator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less