This case was last updated from Adams County Wisconsin Courts on 02/17/2023 at 12:52:01 (UTC).

In the Estate of Karen Sue McCarthy

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 In the Estate of Karen Sue McCarthy was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Adams County Wisconsin Courts, Adams County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Steltenpohl, Kara L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0080

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Adams, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Steltenpohl, Kara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

McCarthy, Bradley D

Loves Park, IL 61111

Decedent

McCarthy, Karen Sue

Loves Park, IL 61111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Casey, Thomas J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Steltenpohl, Kara L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Steltenpohl, Kara L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Steltenpohl, Kara L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Steltenpohl, Kara L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $275000.0; Additional Text: Informal Administration- Inventory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $550.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 007031, Payable Number: 77432, Amount: $550.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's deed; Additional Text: As to: Bradley D. McCarthy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Steltenpohl, Kara L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Steltenpohl, Kara L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate; Court Official: Steltenpohl, Kara L.; Additional Text: Application for Informal Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 081006, Payable Number: 76915, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Steltenpohl, Kara L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Steltenpohl, Kara L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Steltenpohl, Kara L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less