This case was last updated from Fond Du Lac County Courts on 02/01/2023 at 04:48:54 (UTC).

In the Estate of Joyce A Meier

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 In the Estate of Joyce A Meier was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fond Du Lac County Courts, Fond Du Lac County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Woelfel, Brenda L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0078

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Fond du Lac, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Woelfel, Brenda L

 

Party Details

Decedent

Meier, Joyce A

Ripon, WI 54971

Not Yet Classified

Meier, Rick A

Ripon, WI 54971

Meier, Scott T

Springfield, MO 65802

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Liska, Tammy Jo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $66183.59; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $132.37; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 153861, Payable Number: 267606, Receipt Number: 22R 021162, Amount: $132.37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: email from Reporter with draft of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: All claims to be filed on or before September 8, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: BLW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 070118, Payable Number: 261838, Receipt Number: 22R 010331, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less