This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 04/18/2022 at 12:52:15 (UTC).

In the Estate of John M Cigelske

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 In the Estate of John M Cigelske was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Berendes, Diane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0019

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Berendes, Diane

 

Party Details

Decedent

Cigelske, John M

Elroy, WI 53929

Not Yet Classified

Schey, Mary Clare

Columbus, WI 53925

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Strohschein, Alan J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Berendes, Diane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Berendes, Diane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Berendes, Diane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: to: Mary Clare Schey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: final date to file claims: 5/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Berendes, Diane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate; Court Official: Berendes, Diane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 001299, Payable Number: 169422, Receipt Number: 22RT000641, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Mary Clare Schey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Mary Clare Schey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strohschein, Alan J.