This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2023 at 22:59:33 (UTC).

In the Estate of James Francis Erbach

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 In the Estate of James Francis Erbach was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Basting, Kanndie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0051

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Basting, Kanndie

 

Party Details

Decedent

Erbach, James Francis

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Not Yet Classified

Erbach, Peter William

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Interested Parties

Benson, Sandra L

Minneapolis, MN 55437

Benson, Gerald

Minneapolis, MN 55437

Fisher, Kathy

Argos, IN 46501

Fisher, Mike

Argos, IN 46501

Quick, Jeffrey

Brooksville, FL 34613

Quick, Jennifer

Spring Hill, FL 34609

Drews, Dorothy

Chula Vista, CA 91913

Schauwecker, Susan

Summerville, SC 29485

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Keyes, Dean J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Final Date to File Claims: 01/20/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Kathy & Mike Fisher

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Jeffrey Quick

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Jennifer Quick

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: signed November 21, 1990

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Trust Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Amended Trust Agreement - dated October 20 ,1990

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less