This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 23:52:47 (UTC).

In the Estate of Isabelle C Guse

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 In the Estate of Isabelle C Guse was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Steger, Lynn M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0160

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Steger, Lynn M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Guse, Isabelle C

Mayville, WI 53050

Not Yet Classified

Guse, James

Fox Lake, WI 53933

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Koepsell, Katherine Jean

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 056370, Payable Number: 242217, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: from 6 of 6 interested persons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: by James G. Guse

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Codicil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Codicil admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: to James G. Guse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Claims limited to 9/06/2022; Publication: Dodge County Pionier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Koepsell, Katherine Jean