This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 03/05/2023 at 12:53:19 (UTC).

In the Estate of Harold James West

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 In the Estate of Harold James West was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Reynolds, Terry L.A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Reynolds, Terry L.A

 

Party Details

Decedent

West, Harold James

New Lisbon, WI 53950

Not Yet Classified

West, Kay E

New Lisbon, WI 53950

West, Gregory A

New Lisbon, WI 53950

West, Kenneth A

Madison, AL 35756

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Casey, Thomas J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 000052, Payable Number: 134713, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Kay & Kenneth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Kay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less