This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 23:54:36 (UTC).

In the Estate of HAROLD C CHRISTENSEN

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 In the Estate of HAROLD C CHRISTENSEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniels, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0056

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Daniels, James

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BIEDERMANN, CHERYL L

Sayner, WI 54560

Decedent

CHRISTENSEN, HAROLD C

Baraboo, WI 53913

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Houlihan, John Charles

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: Baraboo News Republic - 5/24, 5/31, 6/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 006030, Payable Number: 250518, Receipt Number: 22R 010082, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Additional Text: Cheryl Biedermann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Cheryl Biedermann - Scott Christensen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Cheryl Biedermann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Daniels, James; Additional Text: FDFC - 09/06/2022 - BNR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Daniels, James; Additional Text: Cheryl Biedermann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Houlihan, John Charles