This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 03/11/2023 at 12:59:16 (UTC).

In the Estate of Glenn A. Haddy

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 In the Estate of Glenn A Haddy was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Steger, Lynn M, Behrens, Danell and Sciascia, Joseph G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Steger, Lynn M

Behrens, Danell

Sciascia, Joseph G

 

Party Details

Decedent

Haddy, Glenn A.

Mayville, WI 53050

Not Yet Classified

Haddy, Timothy

Waupun, WI 53963

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: The Petition in this case requests that the case be transferred to informal administration as soon as conveniently possible. Judge Sciascia has indicated that this case can be transferred to informal at this time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Additional Text: WCIS Class Code changed from 50101 (Formal Proceedings) to 50102 (Informal Proceedings).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 011118, Payable Number: 249654, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act; Additional Text: signed by Ronald Wendler and Dianne Wendler

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval; Additional Text: signed by all interested parties (2) requesting Will be admitted and that Timothy Haddy be appointed w/o the requirement for bond; and consent to proceedings being moved to informal administration as soon as conveniently possible

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: by Timothy Haddy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order for administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order limiting time for filing claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less