This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 23:54:26 (UTC).

In the Estate of Gerald G Sjolander

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 In the Estate of Gerald G Sjolander was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schroeder, Nicole R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0090

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schroeder, Nicole R

 

Party Details

Decedent

Sjolander, Gerald G

Onalaska, WI 54650

Not Yet Classified

Sjolander, Steven P

Onalaska, WI 54650

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Fehr, Lee J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Schroeder, Nicole R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Schroeder, Nicole R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Schroeder, Nicole R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Schroeder, Nicole R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003809, Payable Number: 192805, Receipt Number: 22R 007205, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Schroeder, Nicole R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fehr, Lee J