This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 08/29/2022 at 23:53:41 (UTC).

In the Estate of Eugene H. Beier

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 In the Estate of Eugene H Beier was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Kayartz, Julie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0089

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Kayartz, Julie

 

Party Details

Decedent

Beier, Eugene H.

Not Yet Classified

Beier, Ethan

Anderson, Sarah

Beier, Jesse

Beier, Aaron

Waterworth, Martha

Newell, Esther

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Strohschein, Alan J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 006857, Payable Number: 170853, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: beneficiaries/heirs/interested parties - Ethan Beier, Sarah Anderson, Jesse Beier, Aaron Beier, Martha Waterworth, and Esther Newell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Consent to serve as personal representative - Ethan Beier

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: Original - Last Will & Testament of Eugene H. Beier dated January 28, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Claims to be filed on/before: November 15, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: issued to Ethan Beier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strohschein, Alan J.