This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 09/18/2022 at 12:59:14 (UTC).

In the Estate of Dorene B Hale

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 In the Estate of Dorene B Hale was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Rondini, Robert B and Barrett, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1203

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Rondini, Robert B

Barrett, John

 

Party Details

Decedent

Hale, Dorene B

Interested Party

Hale, Darwyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Interested Party Attorney

Robe, Melissa D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Barrett, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claims fee paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 22RP032556

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $240.89; Additional Text: Aurora Health Care Metro, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 067787, Payable Number: 1020767, Receipt Number: 22RP029177, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: Darwyn Hale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Darwyn Hale and Darrell Hale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will; Additional Text: Scanned Copy of Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Melissa D. Robe, J.D. Attorney's office unable to probided an original Will only a copy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Darwyn Hale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Darwyn Hale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robe, Melissa D