This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 03/04/2023 at 12:51:01 (UTC).

In the Estate of Donna J. Radke

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 In the Estate of Donna J Radke was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Washington, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Steger, Lynn M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Steger, Lynn M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Radke, Donna J.

Not Yet Classified

Radke, Scott L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.; Additional Text: to Scott L. Radke

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.; Additional Text: Claims Limited to: 4/19/2023 Publication: Beaver Dam Daily Citizen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 010892, Payable Number: 249402, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: from all interested persons (7)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less