This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:51:13 (UTC).

In the Estate of Donald T. Melbauer, Sr.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 In the Estate of Donald T Melbauer, Sr was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Sheboygan, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Hoffman, Gwen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Hoffman, Gwen

 

Party Details

Decedent

Melbauer, Sr., Donald T.

415 Fairview Way

Shawano, WI 54166

Interested Party

McDowell, Marsha A.

Summerville, SC 29483

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Kabara, Christina J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Hoffman, Gwen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Hoffman, Gwen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Hoffman, Gwen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Security bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 001706, Payable Number: 187236, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less