This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 05/04/2023 at 12:14:40 (UTC).

In the Estate of David E. Buerger

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 In the Estate of David E Buerger was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Dodge, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Steger, Lynn M and Behrens, Danell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0067

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Steger, Lynn M

Behrens, Danell

 

Party Details

Decedent

Buerger, David E.

Not Yet Classified

Wild, Christine M.

LIfestar Emergency Medical Services LLc

Aurora Medical Center of Washington County, Inc

Bank of America, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate for Aurora Medical Center of Washington County, Inc; Amount: $36947.89

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 23R 005958

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate for Bank of America, N.A.; Amount: $15570.62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 23R 005961

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate for LIfestar Emergency Medical Services LLc; Amount: $1683.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Christine M Wild

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Christine M Wild

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.; Additional Text: Claims limited to June 16, 2023, Publication Dodge County Pionier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: Christine M Wild

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less