This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 00:02:49 (UTC).

In the Estate of David C Hill

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 In the Estate of David C Hill was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheffler, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0352

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Sheffler, Brian

 

Party Details

Decedent

Hill, David C

Salem, WI 53168

Not Yet Classified

Geiger, Laura

Cary, IL 60014

Hill-Liautaud, Lorraine

Cary, IL 60014

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 23R 001854 - claim filed by Aurora Medical Group Inc c/o DCM Services for $1,202.52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Signature bond signed; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian; Additional Text: deadline for filing a claim against the estate is 04-28-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian; Additional Text: to Laura Geiger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: 1 - Lorraine Hill-Liautaud

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Signature bond set for Geiger, Laura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: 1 - Laura Geiger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed signature bond; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: by Laura Geiger with Carl R Edenhofer Jr as Resident Agent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 706447, Payable Number: 354805, Receipt Number: 22R 035845, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less