This case was last updated from Lafayette County Wisconsin Courts on 04/18/2022 at 23:56:02 (UTC).

In the Estate of Dalvin L Schultz

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 In the Estate of Dalvin L Schultz was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Lafayette County Wisconsin Courts, Lafayette County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Jorgenson, Duane M and Siegenthaler, Teresa L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0015

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Lafayette, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Jorgenson, Duane M

Siegenthaler, Teresa L

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioners

Schultz, Karen J

South Wayne, WI 53587

Schultz, Karen

South Wayne, WI 53587

Schultz, Kerry

South Wayne, WI 53587

Cook, Kelly

Warren, IL 61087

Schultz, Kevin

Warren, IL 61087

Weier, Krisann

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Schultz, Kraig

Elkhart, KS 67950

Decedent

Schultz, Dalvin L

South Wayne, WI 53587

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent, Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

Sauer, John C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Siegenthaler, Teresa L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Siegenthaler, Teresa L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Siegenthaler, Teresa L.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.; Additional Text: Notice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.; Additional Text: Statement of Informal Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.; Additional Text: Domiciliary Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000625, Payable Number: 66263, Receipt Number: 22R 001176, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sauer, John C.