This case was last updated from Richland County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2023 at 06:49:26 (UTC).

In the Estate of Cynthia L. Caillagh

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 In the Estate of Cynthia L Caillagh was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Richland County Wisconsin Courts, Richland County Circuit Court located in Sheboygan, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Laue, Jenifer and McDougal, Lisa A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0034

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Richland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Laue, Jenifer

McDougal, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioners

Kisgen, Kirstin

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Lerner, Justin

Weber, Hannah

Weber, Finnegan

Decedent

Caillagh, Cynthia L.

Cazenovia, WI 53924

Guardian Ad Litem

Frank, Ted N.

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Petitioner Attorney

Mckinley, Timothy B.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Frank, Ted N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Laue, Jenifer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Laue, Jenifer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $32607.78; Additional Text: Landmark Credit Union

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 23R 000340

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: To: Kirsten Kisgen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Additional Text: Will Dated: September 30, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice interested persons/time limit filing claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 006139, Payable Number: 67336, Receipt Number: 22R 004631, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order appointing GAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice interested persons/ filing claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less