This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 23:51:12 (UTC).

In the Estate of Charles Thomas Bosmans

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 In the Estate of Charles Thomas Bosmans was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Nowakowski, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0372

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Nowakowski, Paul

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

Bosmans, Cynthia Ann

Elkhorn, WI 53121

Bosmans, Cindy Ann

Elkhorn, WI 53121

Semrow, Roberta

Sussex, WI 53089

Bosmans, Anthony

Elkhorn, WI 53121

Bosmans, Kelly

Hartland, WI 53029

Decedent

Bosmans, Charles Thomas

Hartland, WI 53029

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul; Additional Text: *AMENDED* Final date for filing claims is 9/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul; Additional Text: Will dated 4/13/2016 (2 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul; Additional Text: Final date for filing claims is 8/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul; Additional Text: Application granted; Cynthia Bosmans appointed without bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul; Additional Text: Domiciliary letters issued to Cynthia Bosmans.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: filed by Cynthia Bosmans.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Bosmans, Cynthia Ann; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Cynthia Ann Bosmans Current: 438 W Rockwell Street, Elkhorn, WI 53121 United States (Effective: 05-19-2022) Prior: 738 W Rockwell Street, Elkhorn, WI 53121 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Additional Text: filed by Cynthia Bosmans.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Additional Text: filed by Cynthia Bosmans.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: filed by Cynthia Bosmans.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice interested persons/ filing claims; Additional Text: filed by Cynthia Bosmans.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: Dated 4/13/16 - 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less