This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 12/30/2022 at 23:52:59 (UTC).

In the Estate of Carol J Lauterbach

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 In the Estate of Carol J Lauterbach was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Coykendall, Sherry and Coykendall, Sherry D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0215

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Coykendall, Sherry

Coykendall, Sherry D

 

Party Details

Decedent

Lauterbach, Carol J

West Bend, WI 53095

Not Yet Classified

Matthews, Laurie A

West Bend, WI 53095

Lauterbach, James T

Lauterbach, David W

Lauterbach, Joel C

Lauterbach, Martin R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Falkowski, Andrew Gerald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 214585, Payable Number: 172455, Receipt Number: 22R 022609, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Joel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Laurie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: dated: February 7, 1985

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry; Additional Text: Notice waived; bond waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry; Additional Text: Issued to: Laurie A Matthews

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry; Additional Text: Deadline for filing claims: March 17, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Falkowski, Andrew Gerald