This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2023 at 13:24:11 (UTC).

In the Estate of Carly Anne Lincoln

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 In the Estate of Carly Anne Lincoln was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Basting, Kanndie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0027

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Basting, Kanndie

 

Party Details

Decedent

Lincoln, Carly Anne

Not Yet Classified

Beal, Logan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

Jackson, Robert J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $381.43; Additional Text: SSM Health Dean Medical Group

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 002067, Payable Number: 117133, Receipt Number: 22R 003657, Amount: $3.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Signed by Resident Agent - Robert Jackson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: - Logan Beal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: Logan Beal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Final Claim Date: October 10, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less