This case was last updated from Marquette County Courts on 09/27/2022 at 23:54:01 (UTC).

In the Estate of Brian A. Otto

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 In the Estate of Brian A Otto was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Marquette County Courts, Marquette County Circuit Court located in Waukesha, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hendee, Chad A and Goodwin, Mariah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0017

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Marquette, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hendee, Chad A

Goodwin, Mariah

 

Party Details

Decedent

Otto, Brian A.

Winnebago, IL 61088

Interested Party

Otto, Deborah

Winnebago, IL 61088

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Spankowski, Jesse B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Goodwin, Mariah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Goodwin, Mariah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Goodwin, Mariah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Hendee, Chad A.; Court Reporter: BARTOL, JILL; Additional Text: 8:46 AM Interested Person Deborah Otto appeared by video. Attorney Jesse B Spankowski appeared by video for Deborah Otto. Atty Spankowski makes statements. BY THE COURT: Court grants the petition and will sign the order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate determining descent; Court Official: Hendee, Chad A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Certificate of Descent with more precise legal description and more info

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Court Official: Hendee, Chad A.; Court Reporter: BARTOL, JILL; Additional Text: Hearing on September 14, 2022 at 08:45 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition for administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 002043, Payable Number: 75315, Amount: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to Court from Atty Spankowski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed certificate determining descent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2011
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spankowski, Jesse B