This case was last updated from Fond Du Lac County Courts on 01/31/2023 at 11:02:57 (UTC).

In the Estate of Bernice A Parfitt

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 In the Estate of Bernice A Parfitt was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fond Du Lac County Courts, Fond Du Lac County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Woelfel, Brenda L and Walker, Tricia L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0019

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Fond du Lac, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Woelfel, Brenda L

Walker, Tricia L

 

Party Details

Decedent

Parfitt, Bernice A

Not Yet Classified

Kelly, Linda Ann

Liska, Tammy J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Liska, Tammy Jo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $79944.05; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $159.89; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 153736, Payable Number: 267506, Receipt Number: 22R 021012, Amount: $159.89

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Walker, Tricia L.; Court Reporter: Hunt, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Minutes; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for administration; Court Official: Walker, Tricia L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Walker, Tricia L.; Additional Text: TLW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Additional Text: WCIS Class Code changed from 50101 (Formal Proceedings) to 50102 (Informal Proceedings).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Bruce Parfitt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Dan E. Parfitt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Tammy J. Liska

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Francis Parfitt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Jane Essi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Nanette Burnett

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Karen Parfitt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order setting time to hear petition; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: and File Claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Linda A Parfitt Kelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less