This case was last updated from Adams County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 13:02:47 (UTC).

In the Estate of Barton C Held

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 In the Estate of Barton C Held was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Adams County Courts, Adams County Circuit Court located in Waukesha, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Koback, Kathe M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0017

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Adams, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Koback, Kathe M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Held, Barton C

Westfield, WI 53964

Not Yet Classified

Held, Daniel B

Friendship, WI 53934

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Screnock, Paul Steven

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $104748.03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $209.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 026741, Payable Number: 74745, Receipt Number: 22R 001864, Amount: $209.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 22R 001694

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $1645.14; Additional Text: Estate Recovery (RE: Roberta Held - Spouse)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Koback, Kathe M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 013456, Payable Number: 74263, Receipt Number: 22R 000880, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Screnock, Paul Steven