This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 08/24/2022 at 23:49:27 (UTC).

In the Estate of Barbara J Gardetto

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 In the Estate of Barbara J Gardetto was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Mardak, Jeaneen, Barrett, John and Christenson, George L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1240

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Mardak, Jeaneen

Barrett, John

Christenson, George L

 

Party Details

Decedent

Gardetto, Barbara J

Interested Party

Metrie, David

Not Yet Classified

Pouros, Hames

West Bend, WI 53095

Metrie, William

Naples, FL 34114

Angiuli, Susan

Bradenton, FL 34209

Metrie, Bruce

Greenacres, FL 33463

Hill, Jacquelyn

Pelican Lake, WI 54463

Cordelli, Robert

Sun City West, AZ 85375

Gardetto, William W.

Colleyville, TX 76034

Metrie, Daniel

Covina, CA 91724

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Interested Party Attorney

Robe, Melissa D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Barrett, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Denial of application for informal probate; Court Official: Christenson, George L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined; Additional Text: Declined: Matter not appropriate for Informal Administration.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined; Additional Text: Declined: Declined: Matter not appropriate for Informal Administration.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined; Additional Text: Declined: Declined: Matter not appropriate for Informal Administration.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Court Official: Mardak, Jeaneen; Additional Text: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 070746, Payable Number: 1022298, Receipt Number: 22RP030175, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: David Metrie

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Jacqueline R. Hill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: William W. Gardetto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Susan Angiuli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Bruce J. Metrie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Robert Cordelli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Daniel J. Metrie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robe, Melissa D