This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 02/05/2023 at 15:37:18 (UTC).

In the Estate of Alois Fenkl

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 In the Estate of Alois Fenkl was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Fishbain, Bruce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0440

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Fishbain, Bruce

 

Party Details

Decedent

Fenkl, Alois

Racine, WI 53403

Not Yet Classified

Fenkl, Ronald

Racine, WI 53403

Fenkl, Eric

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33305

Fenkl, Dieter

Racine, WI 53406

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Probate, Register In

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce; Additional Text: Amended - Deadline for filing claim date is April 4, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate for Fenkl, Alois; Additional Text: Original WL date: 09/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce; Additional Text: Deadline for filing claims date is March 10, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce; Additional Text: to: Ronald Fenkl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 824628, Payable Number: 469565, Receipt Number: 22R 011506F, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: signed by Ronald Fenkl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act; Additional Text: signed by Carrine Fenkl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: signed by Dieter Fenkl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: signed by Eric Fenkl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: signed by Ronald Fenkl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less