This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2023 at 12:00:07 (UTC).

In the Estate of Alice L. Ladd

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 In the Estate of Alice L Ladd was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Washington, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Basting, Kanndie and Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0064

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Basting, Kanndie

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Decedent

Ladd, Alice L.

Not Yet Classified

Ladd, Eric J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Jackson, Robert J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $1324860.29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $2629.72; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 000243, Payable Number: 118686, Amount: $2,629.72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging special administrator; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: - Eric Ladd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Ann E Ladd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003101, Payable Number: 118120, Amount: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Eric J. Ladd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order for administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less