This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 08:45:09 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Stacey Ann Dickmann and Benjamin James Dickmann

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 In RE the marriage of Stacey Ann Dickmann and Benjamin James Dickmann was filed as a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Walworth, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Sloma, Katherine and Hendrickson, Eric. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Sloma, Katherine

Hendrickson, Eric

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dickmann, Stacey Ann

Shawano, WI 54166

Respondent

Dickmann, Benjamin James

Shawano, WI 54166

Not Yet Classified

Child Support Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Goldman, Jonathan

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Maulson, Larenda J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Sloma, Katherine; Additional Text: Order re Petitioner's notice of voluntary dismissal of action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Sloma, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: Petitioner's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Action-filed by Atty. Goldman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Petitioner's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Action-filed by Atty. Goldman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Financial disclosure statement (FDS) of B. Dickmann.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter re STDH on 5.31.22-filed by Atty. Goldman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Legal Separation on August 16, 2022 at 02:30 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric; Additional Text: Temporary Order - Routing: Petitioner via email Respondent via email Counsel via e-filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit in support of motion; Additional Text: Affidavit in support of motion to amend temporary orders-filed by Atty. Goldman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service of B. Dickmann (OTSC to Amend)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Additional Text: WCIS Class Code changed from 40101 (Divorce) to 40201 (Annulment/Legal Separation).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter from Atty. Goldman to the Court - Requesting conversion from divorce to legal separation. Note- Judge Sloma ok'd switch to legal sepration on 01-11-2022 at 2:46pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons; Additional Text: Summons for Divorce w/Children

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 001544, Payable Number: 179031, Receipt Number: 22R 000268, Amount: $214.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: Petition for Divorce with minor children

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Order to Show Cause for Temporary Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit for Order to show cause for Temporary Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause for temporary order; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less