This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 09:05:05 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Lynn M Hrabik and Clayton H Hrabik

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 In RE the marriage of Lynn M Hrabik and Clayton H Hrabik was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Walworth, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kussel, William F., Jr and Hendrickson, Eric. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kussel, William F., Jr

Hendrickson, Eric

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hrabik, Lynn M

Pulaski, WI 54162

Respondent

Hrabik, Clayton H

Pulaski, WI 54162

Not Yet Classified

Child Support Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Maulson, Larenda J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric; Additional Text: Copies provided to the parties after Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric; Court Reporter: TAPE REPORTER; Additional Text: 2:50 pm. Petitioner Lynn Marie Hrabik in court. Respondent Clayton Howard Hrabik appeared by phone. Petitioner sworn & questioned by the Court. Address/dob verified on record. Court questions Petitioner on her FDS and the parties signed MSA. She testifies to the following: marriage is broken with no chance of reconciliation, not currently pregnant, waives her right to maintenance and wishes to retain her current last name of Hrabik. Respondent sworn & questioned by the Court. Address/dob verified on record. Court questions Respondent on his FDS and the parties signed MSA. Respondent testifies to the following: marriage is broken with no chance of reconciliation and he waives his right to receive maintenance. Parties both testified to the following: 2 minor children, joint legal custody, primary placement to Petitioner w/Respondent having reasonable upon reasonable notice at this time until relocation is complete and Petitioner carries the health insurance on the 2 minor children. No child support at this time due to transitional job situation of Respondent. Ruling- Court finds it has jurisdiction to hear this matter, adopts the MSA into the final divorce decree, grants the divorce and admonishes the parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after court trial; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement; Additional Text: Marital settlement agreement (MSA) w/attached Joint Parenting Plan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Financial disclosure statement (FDS) of Lynn.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Financial disclosure statement (FDS) of Clayton

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Findings of fact, conclusions of law & judgment of divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric; Additional Text: Routing: Parties via email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: Admission of service signed and returned by Clayton.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Review on May 17, 2022 at 09:00 am. Stipulated Divorce Hearing on May 31, 2022 at 03:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $194.5; Additional Text: 22R 000473

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet; Additional Text: Completed 06-1-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit and order to show cause; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less