This case was last updated from Price County Courts on 04/04/2023 at 18:49:02 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Laura K. Upson and Scott A. Upson

Case Summary

On 02/03/2023 In RE the marriage of Laura K Upson and Scott A Upson was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Price County Courts, Price County Circuit Court located in Price, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Klein, Kevin G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0006

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Price, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Klein, Kevin G

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Upson, Laura K.

Upson, Scott A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Schoenborn, Bryce Alan

Melms, Timothy B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 000402, Payable Number: 64126, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: Klein, Kevin G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent for Upson, Scott A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner; Court Official: Klein, Kevin G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 000203, Payable Number: 63884, Amount: $214.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum; Court Official: Klein, Kevin G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less