This case was last updated from Ashland County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 18:08:04 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Lacy LeAnn Hultman and Scott John Hultman

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 In RE the marriage of Lacy LeAnn Hultman and Scott John Hultman was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Ashland County Courts, Ashland County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are McKnight, Kelly J and Siegler, David J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0013

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Ashland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

McKnight, Kelly J

Siegler, David J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hultman, Lacy LeAnn

Mellen, WI 54546

Respondent

Hultman, Scott John

Mellen, WI 54546

Not Yet Classified

Ashland County Child Support

Ashland, WI 54806

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Coleman, Linda Irene

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Nordling, Homer G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order Dismissing Divorce/Legal Separation; Court Official: Siegler, David J.; Additional Text: with kids

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Mailed parties this day: Stip. and order dismissing divorce/legal separation emailed Csup order dismissing divorce/legal separation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop Order Dismissing Divorce/Legal Separation; Court Official: Siegler, David J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stip Dismissing Divorce/Legal Separation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition; Additional Text: Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 017727, Payable Number: 81011, Receipt Number: 22R 001093, Amount: $214.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Child Support Guidelines

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Ed. Program OR w/class schedule mailed to parties this date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on May 10, 2022 at 08:15 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: emailed Csup SAP this day

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nordling, Homer G.