This case was last updated from Taylor County Courts on 03/18/2023 at 18:42:46 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Jenel Waldhart and Kevin Waldhart

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 In RE the marriage of Jenel Waldhart and Kevin Waldhart was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Taylor County Courts, Taylor County Circuit Court located in Washington, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Klein, Kevin, Wachsmuth, Bonnie and Knox-Bauer, Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Taylor, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Klein, Kevin

Wachsmuth, Bonnie

Knox-Bauer, Ann

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Waldhart, Jenel

Respondent

Waldhart, Kevin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Bauer, Joseph L

Paul, Shawn M

Respondent Attorney

Schoenborn, Bryce Alan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Wachsmuth, Bonnie; Location: Taylor County Courthouse, Second Floor; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: for Substitution of Attorneys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketEvent: Motion; Additional Text: for separate judgment for attorney fees and disbursements and consent for substitution of attorneys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit in support of motion; Additional Text: request for judgment for fees and disbursements

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketEvent: Objection; Additional Text: to proposed order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: on Kevin Waldhart

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to FCC Objecting to proposed order 2-9-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEvent: Application for specific judicial assign approved; Court Official: Knox-Bauer, Ann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order assigning judge/judicial assignment order; Court Official: Klein, Kevin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order to appear; Court Official: Knox-Bauer, Ann; Additional Text: Scheduling Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 000121, Payable Number: 72016, Receipt Number: 23R 000208, Amount: $214.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit for temporary order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less