This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 04/20/2022 at 17:36:12 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Corey Randall Johnson and Vicky Lynn Winrich-Johnson

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 In RE the marriage of Corey Randall Johnson and Vicky Lynn Winrich-Johnson was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Snow, Kristine A and Seim, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0103

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Snow, Kristine A

Seim, Steven

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Johnson, Corey Randall

Fox Lake, WI 53933

Respondent

Winrich-Johnson, Vicky Lynn

Beaver Dam, WI 53916

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wolter, Jacquelyn

Respondent Attorney

Smiley, William A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing; Court Official: Seim, Steven; Location: Circuit Court Branch 5; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 044923, Payable Number: 241118, Receipt Number: 22R 006295, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Response of respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling order; Court Official: Snow, Kristine A.; Additional Text: Preliminary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition without Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $204.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 033934, Payable Number: 240432, Receipt Number: 22R 005137, Amount: $204.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smiley, William A